Dogfen lywodraethu MYAWARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUN 2017 as amended on 29 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS WHO SUFFER FROM MYASTHENIA GRAVIS, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND PROVIDE COMFORT AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MYASTHENIA GRAVIS AND TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO MYASTHENIA GRAVIS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE, UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.