Dogfen lywodraethu SUE RYDER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/11/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31/07/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2015 as amended on 12 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are: 1. to provide or assist in the provision of care for persons suffering from any disability, incapacity or illness, whether physical or mental, 2. to relieve the needs of those people potentially excluded from society by reason of old age, ill health (physical or mental), disability, poverty, or criminal history, and to assist in their integration into society for the public benefit; 3. To advance the education of the public about the causes of disability, incapacity or illness, whether physical or mental and the means of relieving those needs. 4. To relieve the mental and physical suffering of persons affected by bereavement or loss, including by the provision of counselling and support for such persons.
Maes buddion
WORLD-WIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.