Dogfen lywodraethu DOWNS SYNDROME DIAMOND FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 APR 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME, AND 3.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON ACCOUNT OF THEM HAVING DOWN'S SYNDROME OR THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.