Governing document spruse Stevenage Reuse Scheme
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1995 AMENDED 14 JULY 1999 as amended on 14 Jul 2001 as amended on 07 Dec 2016 as amended on 14 Sep 2019 as amended on 08 Dec 2020 as amended on 07 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE BOTH GENERALLY AND INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN STEVENAGE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.