Dogfen lywodraethu HIGHFIELD PARK TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2013 as amended on 05 Feb 2024 as amended on 26 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are for the public benefit and specifically restricted to the promotion primarily for the benefit of the local community of Highfield and its neighbourhood within the area served by St Albans City and District Council of: a) the establishment and maintenance of a rural park in Highfield; b) the preservation, protection and enhancement of features to benefit the landscape and its flora and fauna c) the assistance in or provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life; d) the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the said park; and e) otherwise promoting all or any charitable purposes for the benefit of the said inhabitants
Maes buddion
THE AREA SERVED BY ST ALBANS CITY AND DISTRICT COUNCIL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.