Dogfen lywodraethu PARKHAVEN TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17/06/1948, 19/10/1971, 27/09/1989, 28/09/1994, 23/06/1999, 22/09/08 & BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1998 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY, LEARNING, PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY HOMES, RESIDENTIAL CARE, NURSING HOME CARE AND A RANGE OF DAY AND DOMICILIARY CARE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.