Dogfen lywodraethu BRISTOL OLD VIC AND THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 APR 1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 APR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS; AND 2) TO CONSERVE, DEVELOP AND ENHANCE THE PREMISES KNOWN AS THE THEATRE ROYAL, BRISTOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AS A WORKING THEATRE AND A PLACE WITH HISTORIC ASSOCIATIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.