Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL PONY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS ALTERED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 26/3/1963 AND 7/8/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 10/12/1997 AND EGM ON 11/3/2000 AND AGM 21/4/ 2001 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24/11/05 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 FEB 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF PONY BREEDING AND TO ENCOURAGE THE USE AND PROTECTION OF PONIES. (2) TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH THE PONY AND THE USE AND MANAGEMENT THEREOF. (FOR ANCILLARY OBJECTS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.