Trustees HERTFORDSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 250399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Profit | Chair |
|
||||||
Marion Maher | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rahat Aboobaker | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eccleston | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanna Mary Defries | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline Mary Ellis | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS Maureen Anne Styles | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Phillippa Joan MaCKINNON | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN KINGSLAND | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||
PAMELA DEIRDRE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
Joyce Elizabeth Spackman | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.