Dogfen lywodraethu KIDNEY RESEARCH UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT AND INTO THE DISEASES WHICH AFFECT THEM. SUCH RESEARCH INCLUDES EPIDEMIOLOGICAL,CLINICAL AND BASIC RESEARCH DIRECTED TOWARDS UNDERSTANDING THE PROCESSES RESPONSIBLE FOR KIDNEY DISEASE AS WELL AS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EVALUATION OF TREATMENT OF DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT; 3.2 THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND RESEARCH ABOUT THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT AND THEIR DISEASES BY ALL POSSIBLE MEANS AND AS WIDELY AS POSSIBLE IN A MANNER WHICH CAN BEST SERVE THOSE WHO MAY BENEFIT; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE; AND 3.4 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT KIDNEY DISEASE AND THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM IT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.