Dogfen lywodraethu CORDA PREVENTING HEART DISEASE AND STROKE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF, AND RESEARCH INTO THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OR COMPLAINTS OF THE HEART, IN PARTICULAR TO RAISE AND APPLY FUNDS FOR SPECIFIC AREAS OF CARDIAC SURGICAL RESEARCH RELATED TO ASPECTS OF PREVENTATIVE MEDICINE, TREATMENT AND NEW CARDIO-DIAGNOSTIC TECHNIQUES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.