Dogfen lywodraethu THE ARTS SOCIETY CHICHESTER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH JUNE 1980 AMENDED 11TH NOVEMBER 1997 AND 12TH NOVEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2017 as amended on 12 Jan 2021 as amended on 12 Jan 2021 as amended on 12 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS; THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ARTISTIC HERITAGE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.