Dogfen lywodraethu THEATRE ROYAL (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 1981, AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED 3 DEC 1981, 25 MAR 1997, 7 NOV 2002, 21 OCT 2004, 30 JAN 2007 AND 27 SEPT 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2017 as amended on 12 May 2020 as amended on 12 May 2020 as amended on 07 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC (II) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES FOR ANY OF THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN (I) OR (II) PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.