Accounts and annual returns THE PROSCENIUM LODGE NO 3435 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 285669
Charity reporting is overdue by 1676 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 215 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 215 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 580 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 580 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 945 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 945 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1309 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1309 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1676 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window