Dogfen lywodraethu BROADLAND MERIDIAN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PSYCHIATRIC OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL REHABILITATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.