Governing document BRITTEN SINFONIA LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 MARCH 1983, 9 JULY 1990, 14 MARCH 1996 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OR SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PERFORMING AND PROVIDING PUBLIC CONCERT RECITALS AND LECTURES, AND BY PROVIDING EDUCATION PROJECTS FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE AREA AND IN EAST ANGLIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.