Governance THE 1ST EASTCOTE TRUST
Charity number: 291892
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
Registration history:
- 14 June 1985: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 November 2015: Re-registered
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 October 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- The 1st Eastcote Trust/1st Eastcote Scout Group (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.