Trustees WATTON VILLAGE HALL (KNOWN AS QUEEN'S HALL)
Charity number: 304106
Charity reporting is overdue by 256 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Rix | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AIMEE NEALE | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Bell | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Puddick | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Brannan | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Vellam | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY COLLINS | Trustee | 09 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
STACY WILKINSON | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
VAL SIMPSON | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
STELLA LEONARD | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN HAIG WYKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET GEORGINA LUNDIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.