Dogfen lywodraethu BRYANSTON SCHOOL INCORPORATED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/11/1927 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL IN OR NEAR BLANDFORD FORUM, DORSET AND BY OTHER INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.