Accounts and annual returns CRAMLINGTON KIDS CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1063927
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 264 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 285 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window