Dogfen lywodraethu Yorkshire and Humberside Asbestos Victims Support Group
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 DEC 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY RAISING AWARENESS AMONGST MEDICAL STAFF, GENERAL PUBLIC AND WORKERS, IN THE DANGERS AND HAZARDS OF ASBESTOS AND ITS RELATED DISEASES, AND; TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FROM SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.