Dogfen lywodraethu MANKIND INITIATIVE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2 NOVEMBER, 1999 AND AMENDED ON 15 MAY, 2001 AND 1 NOVEMBER, 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 2017 as amended on 29 Jun 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 THE ALLEVIATION OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THOSE SUFFERING SUCH HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY; 2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF MEN'S HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMPANY SHALL DECIDE; 3 THE PREVENTION OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST MALES ON THE GROUND OF SEX SO FAR AS SUCH DISCRIMINATION IS UNLAWFUL.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.