Dogfen lywodraethu ONE NORTH EAST LONDON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 MARCH 2002 AND 12 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 10 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS ADDICTED TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH AND EAST AREAS OF LONDON AND TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO OVERCOME THE PROBLEMS ATTACHED TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUG ADDICTION. TO OFFER SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND PARTNERS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM THE PROBLEMS OF ADDICTION INCLUDING DRUGS, ALCOHOL, GAMBLING, EATING DISORDERS OR ANY OTHER ADDICTION.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.