Dogfen lywodraethu Go Beyond Charity
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 13 FEBRUARY 2009. as amended on 18 Dec 2020 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 29 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The relief of young people in poverty or financial hardship or who are otherwise socially or socially and economically disadvantaged and in particular (but without limitation) by the provision of respite breaks, holidays and residential and non-residential courses to such young people who would not otherwise have a holiday or such education opportunities.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.