Governing document Integrating
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 4 DECEMBER 2001 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APRIL 2006 AND ON 12 SEPTEMBER 2007 as amended on 24 Jan 2024 as amended on 15 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WITH DISABILITIES, AND THEIR FAMILIES WITHIN COUNTY DURHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS, BY ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING INTEGRATED PLAY AND ACCESS TO MAINSTREAM LEISURE SERVICES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND 2. THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY DURHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.