Dogfen lywodraethu ELLEN MACARTHUR CANCER TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/11/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/08/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING AND PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, LEUKAEMIA OR OTHER SERIOUS ILLNESS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SAILING TRIPS, SAILING HOLIDAYS AND OTHER SIMILAR ACTIVITIES; AND 2) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.