Dogfen lywodraethu Age UK South Gloucestershire Ltd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 02 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: 3.1.1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; 3.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3.1.3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); 3.1.4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.1.5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 3.1.6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.1.7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
IN AND AROUND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.