Dogfen lywodraethu HARM REDUCTION INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JUL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 APR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 FEB 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH AND SAFETY BY: (A) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF DRUG USE AND ASSOCIATED PROBLEMS, (PARTICULARLY RELATING TO ILLICIT DRUGS, ALCOHOL AND TOBACCO); (B) DEVELOPING POLICIES AND STRATEGIES TO REDUCE LEVELS OF HARM ASSOCIATED WITH DRUG USE; (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ORGANISATIONS IN POLICIES AND STRATEGIES TO REDUCE LEVELS OF HARM ASSOCIATED WITH DRUG USE; AND (D) DISSEMINATING AND SHARING INFORMATION WITH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL AGENCIES INVOLVED IN REDUCING HEALTH AND SOCIAL PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH DRUG USE..
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.