Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHESTER HEART SUPPORT GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 04/05/2015 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2015 as amended on 06 May 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS FROM CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM, OR HAVE SUFFERED; HEART DISEASE OR HEART CONDITION ( CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE) BY PROVIDING HELP, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS FROM CHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM OR RECOVERING FROM HEART DISEASE OR HEART CONDITIONS ( CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EXERCISE, RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME WITH THE AIM TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.