Trustees MUSWELL HILL METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Simpson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Casale | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie R Stobbs | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jon Simms | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Simpson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Amoako | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theodora Mdingi | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Lunn | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eedle | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Elmer | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Glynn | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Combes | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MS C SIMMS | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR J ABSON | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS D L GAITSKELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
D A WATSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.