Accounts and annual returns STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL, LITTLEPORT
Charity number: 1137396
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 350 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2023 | 510 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2023 | 510 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window