Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH SOCIETY OF UROGYNAECOLOGY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2011 as amended on 13 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF UROGYNAECOLOGY ARE: 2.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.1.1 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND MANAGEMENT OF FEMALE PELVIC FLOOR DYSFUNCTION INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, URINARY INCONTINENCE, PELVIC ORGAN PROLAPSE AND FAECAL INCONTINENCE; 2.1.2 RAISING AND SETTING STANDARDS OF TRAINING IN UROGYNAECOLOGY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF A NETWORK OF SUPPORT THROUGH DISCUSSION, STUDY AND COMMUNICATION; 2.1.3 AIDING AN EFFECTIVE CLINICAL NETWORK OF CARE FOR UROGYNAECOLOGY PATIENTS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND; AND 2.1.4 BY PROVIDING A FORUM FOR PRACTITIONERS WITH AN INTEREST IN UROGYNAECOLOGY THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.