Trustees 1ST SOWERBY SCOUTS
Charity number: 503423
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine Elizabeth Kee | Chair | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jayne Harrison | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faith Coy | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Cummins | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Paul Foy | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Susan Dale | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Veronique Charvet | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LAMOND | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Neil Goom | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Christine Mary Ridsdale | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Polly Crook | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.