Dogfen lywodraethu HATCH ENTERPRISE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 AUG 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 18-30 BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING COURSES AND OTHER SUPPORT, TO HELP BUILD SKILLS AND CONFIDENCE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.