Dogfen lywodraethu ONE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2015 as amended on 10 Jul 2018 as amended on 31 Jan 2022 as amended on 31 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4.1 THE COMPANY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 PROVIDE A RANGE OF PERSONALISED SUPPORT TO ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES WHO MAY ALSO HAVE A PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND/OR EMOTIONAL DIFFICULTIES; AND/OR 4.1.2 PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE (TOGETHER THE "OBJECTS").
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.