Dogfen lywodraethu NASRUL-LAHI-IL-FATIH DAGENHAM UK LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 MAY 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT. 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, HEALTH, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, GENDER OR RELIGION AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT. 3) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, PARTICULARLY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.