Dogfen lywodraethu GADDUM CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/01/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2014 as amended on 01 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ELSEWHERE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Maes buddion
GREATER MANCHESTER AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.