Trustees DARTFORD LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1182354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avtar Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Subhash Goswami | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bidur Ghimire | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellenor Elizabeth Palmer | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ragbhir Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Samantha Vera Davis-Ashdown | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Keith Tandy | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Milne Breakwell Davidson | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Illsley | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.