Governing document NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WOMEN'S AID LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/04/2011 as amended on 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OF PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR THE MEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE LIVING AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.