Dogfen lywodraethu MANCHESTER MACCABI COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CLUB
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1969 AS AMENDED 3 AUGUST 1969, 8 APRIL 1979, 28 JUNE 1982, 9 OCTOBER 1983 AND 25 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 OCT 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT, WITH A FOCUS ON THE JEWISH COMMUNITY THE RESIDENTS OF BURY, MANCHESTER, SALFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, CULTURE, SOCIAL WELFARE AND COHESION AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE OF THE RESIDENTS AND OTHERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.