Dogfen lywodraethu Newton on Ouse Community Association
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 28/07/1953 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 OCT 2022 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT IS TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWTON ON OUSE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF NEWTON-ON-OUSE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.