Trustees MALVERN ST JAMES LIMITED
Charity number: 527513
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Bruce | Chair | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CDR SUSIE JANE MORAN | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HODGES | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Walton | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Usher | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Ellis | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Palmer | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Pearce | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE KELLY | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WARNE | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MAGDALENE COLES | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.