Charity overview CLARA BARONESS DE HIRSCH CONVALESCENT FUND
Charity number: 209723-50
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 16 MARCH 1934, 2 AUGUST 1898 AND 4 JULY 1930
Charitable objects
DEFRAYING COST OF MAINTENANCE IN CONVALSCENT HOMES FOR SICK OR INFIRM POOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 22 January 1963: Standard registration
- 03 June 2009: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 June 2009: Funds transferred to 802559-14 CLARA BARONESS DE HIRSCH CONVALESCENT FUND
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.