Dogfen lywodraethu THE WILLIAM HARVEY RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 JULY 1999 AND 10 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 OCT 2016 as amended on 06 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects for which the Company is established are to promote and support for the benefit of the public, medical research (at the Company?s accommodation at St. Bartholomew?s Hospital Medical College or elsewhere) leading to new treatments for cardiovascular, metabolic, inflammatory and other diseases and to disseminate the results thereof
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.