Trustees DEVON COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 301073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JARVIS | Chair | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Alexander John Anthony Hammond | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Anthony Hill | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JANE ALEXANDRA BATCHELOR MAAT | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Jayne Pacey | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rory Alexander Fitz-Gerald | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK SOLWAY | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Steven Ambrose Peter Donohue | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES LITTLEJOHNS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.