Trustees CONTEMPORARY GLASS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1153382
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helen Slater Stokes | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angel Ben Monzon Alvaro | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Coleman OBE | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Reid | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Fawcett | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL PHILIP BARNES | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Sarah Brown | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hope | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.