Governing document DERBY HIGH SCHOOL TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/11/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.