Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Charity number: 1030406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Laurent Salomon | Chair | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandros Sotiriadis | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ritsuko Pu | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fatima Crispi Brillas | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Condous | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Meagher | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Preisler Romanow | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Asma Khalil | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aly Youssef | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Liona Poon | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reem Abu-Rustum | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Daniela Fischerova | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Thomas Bourne | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Caterina Bilardo | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.