Governing document RAVENSHEAD COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity number: 1059851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1996,16 APRIL 1997, 24 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT FOR THE INHABITANTS OF RAVENSHEAD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
RAVENSHEAD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.