Governing document ST MARY REDCLIFFE CHURCH LANDS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED BY LETTERS PATENT IN 1588 AND 1591 AND SUBSEQUENT DEEDS. REP. VOL. 7 P 277 AND AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 15TH JUNE 1909 AND 5TH NOVEMBER 1957 AND 12TH AUGUST 1986 AND RESOLUTION DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2018 AND ORDER DATED 22 MARCH 2018 AND EFFECTIVE 6 APRL 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF ST. MARY REDCLIFFE CHURCH. 2. THE CONDUCT OF DIVINE SERVICE THEREIN. 3. SUCH OTHER GOOD AND CHARITABLE USES IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. MARY REDCLIFFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.